This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 17:17:36 (UTC).

Lisa Lubarsky v. The City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 Lisa Lubarsky filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The City of New York. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas P Aliotta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas P Aliotta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Lubarsky

Defendants

FJC Security Services Inc

The City of New York

New York City Parks & Recreation

Allied-City Wide Inc

Allied Universal Ltd

Allied Barton Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMAGNOLO, JOSEPH ANTHONY

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph A Romagnolo Esq

Defendant Attorneys

WILSON, BRADLEY LEE

Attorney at The Brown Law Firm, P.C.

WODARSKI, JOSEPH P

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

EISON, HOWARD

Attorney at NYC LAW DEPARTMENT

FAMULARI, GIANNA M.

Attorney at New York City Law Department, Staten Island Tort Office

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

DEMAND FOR: insurance infor

DEMAND FOR: insurance infor; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

RESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

RESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Wodarski, J.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Famulari, G.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)

SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2019; Received: 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: insurance infor; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Eison, H.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Wodarski, J.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Famulari, G.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less