Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 23:10:49 (UTC).

LISA GONZALEZ v. SHOPRITE OF CHESTER PLAZA, NY et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 LISA GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHOPRITE OF CHESTER PLAZA, NY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig S Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Craig S Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Gonzalez

Defendants

SHOPRITE OF CHESTER PLAZA, NY

CHESTER MALL, L.L.C.

SUEHOPE REALTY INC.

Ilona R. Resnick

SHOP-RITE SUPERMARKETS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOBO, GREGORY MARC

Attorney at SOBO & SOBO L.L.P.

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS, ALAN R

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALAN R. LEWIS

OLESON, RICHARD C

Attorney at OCONNOR MCGUINESS CONTE DOYLE & OLESON, LLP

ALAGNA, ROBERTA LUCILLE

Attorney at O'Connor McGuinness Conte Doyle Oleson Watson & Loftus, LLP

SNITILY, MONICA G

Attorney at O'CONNOR, MCGUINESS, CONTE, DOYLE & OLESON

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Brown

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Brown; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Brown

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Brown; Filed By: Alagna, R.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Partial Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Partial Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Alagna, R.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Oleson, R.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Ilona L. Resnick

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Ilona L. Resnick; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service.Answer&Demands

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service.Answer&Demands Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

ANSWER Answer & Demands

ANSWER Answer & Demands; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Shoprite of Chester Plaza, NY

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Shoprite of Chester Plaza, NY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. Brown; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Brown; Filed By: Alagna, R.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Partial Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Alagna, R.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Multiple Discovery Demands; Filed By: Oleson, R.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Oleson, R.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Ilona L. Resnick; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service.Answer&Demands Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer & Demands; Filed By: Lewis, A.; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service on Shoprite of Chester Plaza, NY; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sobo, G.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less