Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 03:14:23 (UTC).

LINDA SCHMIDT as Executrix for the Estate of et al v. AAMCO TRANSMISSION, INC et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 LINDA SCHMIDT as Executrix for the Estate of filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AAMCO TRANSMISSION, INC. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Libert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jack Libert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda Schmidt AS EXECUTRIX FOR THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM J. SCHMIDT and LINDA SCHMIDT, Individually

Linda Schmidt AS EXECUTRIX FOR THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM J. SCHMIDT and

Defendants

McCORD CORPORATION

FEDERAL- MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST as a successor to FELT PRODUCTS MFG. CO

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

AAMCO TRANSMISSION, INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

PFIZER, INC. (PFIZER)

AUTO BARN STORES, INC

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

DANA COMPANIES, LLC

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC

AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC., n/k/a RHONE POULENC AG COMPANY n/k/a BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC

U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL)

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., f/k/a ALLIED SIGNAL, INC. / BENDIX

BMCE INC. F/K/A UNITED CENTRIFUGAL PUMP

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris, Inc.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENGARTEN, CLARK PELLER

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

SCHOLZ, ANDREW J

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

GREEN, ALEXANDER TRENCH

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

O'LEARY, RICHARD PATRICK

Attorney at TROUTMAN SANDERS LLP

THOMPSON, JENNIFER JASMINE WINNIE

WATT, LAUREN ALYSE

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

PENNIE, NANCY L

Attorney at AARONSON RAPPAPORT FEINSTEIN & DEUTSCH

KIM, BRIAN YOON

Attorney at AARONSON RAPPAPORT FEINSTEIN & DEUTSCH, LLP

ZUCKER, ELLIOT JORDAN

Attorney at AARONSON RAPPAPORT FEINSTEIN & DEUTSCH LLP

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

GASIOR, JOAN M.

Attorney at Renzulli Law Firm LLP

DILONARDO, ANNA M.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

PUGLIESE, DONALD R

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KLEIN, GARY R

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG PC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO FORD MOTOR COMPANY

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Filed By: Kim, B.; Filed: 06/24/2020; Received: 06/24/2020

DEMAND FOR: Notice of Fel-Pro's Response to Plaintiffs' Product Identification Interrogatories and Document Requests

DEMAND FOR: Notice of Fel-Pro's Response to Plaintiffs' Product Identification Interrogatories and Document Requests; Filed By: Green, A.; Filed: 06/19/2020; Received: 06/19/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO COURT ON BEHALF OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO COURT ON BEHALF OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Filed By: Kim, B.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) PROPOSED ORDER AS TO FORD MOTOR COMPANY

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) PROPOSED ORDER AS TO FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Filed By: Kim, B.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

ORDER - OTHER so ordered stip of disc

ORDER - OTHER so ordered stip of disc; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

ORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal, with Prejudice, as to Defendant Pfizer, Inc.

ORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal, with Prejudice, as to Defendant Pfizer, Inc.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Thompson, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosengarten, C.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Filed By: Kim, B.; Filed: 06/24/2020; Received: 06/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Notice of Fel-Pro's Response to Plaintiffs' Product Identification Interrogatories and Document Requests; Filed By: Green, A.; Filed: 06/19/2020; Received: 06/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Executed Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Amchem Products, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE LETTER TO COURT ON BEHALF OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Filed By: Kim, B.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) PROPOSED ORDER AS TO FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Filed By: Kim, B.; Filed: 06/17/2020; Received: 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER so ordered stip of disc; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/16/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Order of Dismissal, with Prejudice, as to Defendant Pfizer, Inc.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/02/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 06/01/2020; Received: 06/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A; Filed By: Gasior, J.; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Thompson, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rosengarten, C.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less