This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 16:02:48 (UTC).

LINDA RIVERA et al - v. - 400 NORTH CORONA OWNERS, INC et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 LINDA RIVERA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 400 NORTH CORONA OWNERS, INC. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2016

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Catherine Rizzo

Linda Rivera

Defendants

Bradford Mott

Michael Miller

400 NORTH CORONA OWNERS, INC

Trish Espinal

Robert Favata

MONTE CARLO LLC

Michelle Dragotti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DILEONARDO, DIANA PATRICIA

Attorney at Schneider Buchel LLP

SCHNEIDER, MARC HARRIS

Attorney at SCHNEIDER BUCHEL LLP

BIZZARO, THOMAS ANDREW

Attorney at Schneider Mitola LLP

Defendant Attorneys

HALPERIN, GUY SLOAN

Attorney at THE LAW FIRM OF GUY S. HALPERIN, PLLC

ECKSTEIN, BARBARA PATRICIA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BARBARA ECKSTEIN

WALLACE, WILLIAM G

Attorney at FAVATA & WALLACE LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #005) Supplemental Affidavit in Opposition of Bradford Mott

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #005) Supplemental Affidavit in Opposition of Bradford Mott; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

INTERROGATORIES Interrogatories to Monte Carlo LLC and Bradford Mott

INTERROGATORIES Interrogatories to Monte Carlo LLC and Bradford Mott; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Statements, Witnesses, & Experts to All Defendants

DEMAND FOR: Demand for Statements, Witnesses, & Experts to All Defendants; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection to All Defendants

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection to All Defendants; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

INTERROGATORIES Interrogatories to Plaintiffs

INTERROGATORIES Interrogatories to Plaintiffs; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

PETITION (AMENDED) FILED IN HARD COPY BEFORE CONVERSION/w Notice

PETITION (AMENDED) FILED IN HARD COPY BEFORE CONVERSION/w Notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Notice of Petition and Amended Verified Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Notice of Petition and Amended Verified Petition; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) So Ordered Stipulation

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) So Ordered Stipulation; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Order to Show Cause - 5-17-16

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Order to Show Cause - 5-17-16; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) *Corrected*; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

PETITION (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)

PETITION (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2016; Received: 06/29/2017

CONSENT TO EFILING

CONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2016; Received: 06/29/2017

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION

COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2016; Received: 06/29/2017

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #005) Supplemental Affidavit in Opposition of Bradford Mott; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES Interrogatories to Monte Carlo LLC and Bradford Mott; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Statements, Witnesses, & Experts to All Defendants; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Inspection to All Defendants; Filed By: Dileonardo, D.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES Interrogatories to Plaintiffs; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Schedule A to Offering Plan; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Notice of Petition and Amended Verified Petition; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) So Ordered Stipulation; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Order to Show Cause - 5-17-16; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) *Corrected*; Filed By: Halperin, G.; Filed: 05/01/2017; Received: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION (AMENDED) FILED IN HARD COPY BEFORE CONVERSION/w Notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2016; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2016; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2016; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less