This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:51:46 (UTC).

Linda Kelly - v. - Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Linda Kelly filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Kelly

Defendant and Petitioner

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Respondents

Jolly Roofing and Contracting Company, Inc.

RoofConnect

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALTESE, CARL ALESSANDRO

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CARL MALTESE

Petitioner Attorney

AISHA K. BROSNAN

Defendant Attorneys

BROSNAN, AISHA K.

Attorney at Brody Oconnor and Oconoor

O'CONNOR, PATRICIA A

Attorney at BRODY, O'CONNOR & O'CONNOR, ESQS.

Respondent Attorneys

KEVIN PATRICK SLATTERY (1182117388)

RONALD E STEINVURZEL MARC D SLOANE (6842.0062)

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Court

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Court; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Combined Demands For Disocvery and Inspection

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Combined Demands For Disocvery and Inspection; Filed By: Sloane, M.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

ANSWER Counter-Claims

ANSWER Counter-Claims; Filed By: Sloane, M.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

ANSWER Cross Claims

ANSWER Cross Claims; Filed By: Sloane, M.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Sloane, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Brosnan, A.; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/17/2018

ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT; Filed By: Steinvurzel, R.; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 11/30/2018

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Counterclaim to Third Party Complaint with Demands and Notices

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Counterclaim to Third Party Complaint with Demands and Notices; Filed By: Slattery, K.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brosnan, A.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2018; Received: 01/23/2018

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation; Filed By: Brosnan, A.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PC Request

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PC Request; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: O'Connor, P.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT S & C

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT S & C; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Court; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Combined Demands For Disocvery and Inspection; Filed By: Sloane, M.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Counter-Claims; Filed By: Sloane, M.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Cross Claims; Filed By: Sloane, M.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Sloane, M.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Brosnan, A.; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT; Filed By: Steinvurzel, R.; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 11/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Counterclaim to Third Party Complaint with Demands and Notices; Filed By: Slattery, K.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brosnan, A.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/23/2018; Received: 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation; Filed By: Brosnan, A.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PC Request; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 11/30/2017; Received: 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 09/20/2017; Received: 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: O'Connor, P.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT S & C; Filed By: Maltese, C.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less