Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/01/2020 at 23:51:52 (UTC).

LIBERTY GROUP NEVADA HOLDINGS - v. - THE ASSESSOR AND THE BOARD OF ASSESSMENT REVIEW OF THE CITY OF CORNING, AND THE CITY OF CORNING, COUNTY OF STEUBEN, NEW YORK

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 LIBERTY GROUP NEVADA HOLDINGS filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against THE ASSESSOR AND THE BOARD OF ASSESSMENT REVIEW OF THE CITY OF CORNING, AND THE CITY OF CORNING, COUNTY OF STEUBEN, NEW YORK. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********11CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIBERTY GROUP NEVADA HOLDINGS

Defendants

City Assessor Corning

CORNING CITY BOARD ASSESSMENT REVIEW

City Corning

Not Yet Classified

Corning Painted Post Area School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LACAP, HENRY

Attorney at Janata, Lacap & Hazen, LLP

Defendant Attorney

MAGGS, BRYAN JAMES

Attorney at Bryan J. Maggs Law Offices, PLLC

Not Yet Classified Attorney

WILLIAMS, TED HENRY

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER Stipulation and Order of Settlement

ORDER - OTHER Stipulation and Order of Settlement; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

ORDER - OTHER AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - OTHER AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Maggs, B.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES

STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Stipulation and Order of Settlement; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Maggs, B.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Williams, T.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Lacap, H.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less