Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 22:52:38 (UTC).

Lia Fitzgerald v. Mercy Hospital of Buffalo et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 Lia Fitzgerald filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Mercy Hospital of Buffalo. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick J Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frederick J Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lia Fitzgerald

Defendants

Jessica Ogorchock M.D.

Julie Thomas D.O.

Manjunath Markandaya M.D.

Elvin Witmer M.D.

Mercy Hospital of Buffalo

Orchard Park Family Practice, P.C.

Elinor Markowski N.P.

Shannon Kasper N.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODGERS, PETER T.

Attorney at LACY KATZEN RYEN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

SWEET, KATHLEEN MARIE

Attorney at GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

GRABOWSKI, MELINDA LEA

Attorney at GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY, LLP

VISCO, JOHN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Correspondence & Emails

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Correspondence & Emails; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Letter from Court

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Letter from Court; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Responses

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Responses; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Enclosure letters & affs. of service

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Enclosure letters & affs. of service; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Cross-Notice EBTs

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Cross-Notice EBTs; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Plaintiff Discovery Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Plaintiff Discovery Demands; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Correspondence & Emails; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Letter from Court; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Responses; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Enclosure letters & affs. of service; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Cross-Notice EBTs; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Plaintiff Discovery Demands; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice to Medicaid Pursuant to CPLR 306-c Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Rodgers, P.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less