This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 10:16:16 (UTC).

LG Funding, LLC - v. - American Cleaning Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 LG Funding, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Cleaning Company, LLC. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John Galasso. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John Galasso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LG Funding, LLC

Defendants

Brisida Bibashani a/k/a Brisida Tomson Bibashani

American Cleaning Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN, GENE W

Attorney at Gene Rosen's Law Firm

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

--none--

AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES

This accompanies the judgment on notice.

BILL OF COSTS

--none--

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)

Judgment on Notice

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Order

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

PROOF OF SERVICE

--none--

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Reported Decisions List

EXHIBIT(S)

Non-Military Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S)

Additional Mailing

EXHIBIT(S)

Proof of Service - Brisida Bibashani

EXHIBIT(S)

Proof of Service - American Cleaning Company, LLC

EXHIBIT(S)

Summons & Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

Notice of Motion for Default Judgment

PROOF OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service on Brisida Bibashani a/k/a Brisida Tomson Bibashani of Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Mandatory Electronic Filing, Summons, and Verified Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/06/2018; Received: 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES This accompanies the judgment on notice.; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 07/18/2018; Received: 07/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* Judgment on Notice; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Reported Decisions List; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Non-Military Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Additional Mailing; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Proof of Service - Brisida Bibashani; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Proof of Service - American Cleaning Company, LLC; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Default Judgment; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Brisida Bibashani a/k/a Brisida Tomson Bibashani of Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Mandatory Electronic Filing, Summons, and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on American Cleaning Company, LLC of Notice of Commencement of Action Subject to Mandatory Electronic Filing, Summons, and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 02/07/2018; Received: 02/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Rosen, G.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less