This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 14:33:55 (UTC).

LETOM MANAGEMENT, LLC v. Deutsche Bank, USA et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 LETOM MANAGEMENT, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Deutsche Bank, USA. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Landicino, Pt 81. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Landicino, Pt 81

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LETOM MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendants

Wendy Traxler

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Deutsche Bank, USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAFFNER, STEVE R.

Attorney at GORDON & HAFFNER, LLP

Defendant Attorney

PHILIP, LIJUE THOMAS

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Stipulation Withdrawing Motion

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Stipulation Withdrawing Motion; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Haffner, S.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Haffner, S.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) dtd 9/25/19

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) dtd 9/25/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) NYSCEF Document List

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) NYSCEF Document List; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Demand for Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service by NYSCEF

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service by NYSCEF; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint

DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Haffner, S.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Stipulation Withdrawing Motion; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 11/11/2019; Received: 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Haffner, S.; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Haffner, S.; Filed: 10/16/2019; Received: 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) dtd 9/25/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) NYSCEF Document List; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons with Notice; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service by NYSCEF; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COMPLAINT Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint; Filed By: Philip, L.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Haffner, S.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less