Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 03/11/2021 at 00:24:39 (UTC).

Leonard Mazurkiewicz et al v. Mercy Hospital of Buffalo et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Leonard Mazurkiewicz filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Mercy Hospital of Buffalo. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry Nowak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Henry Nowak

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jennylu Mazurkiewicz

Leonard Mazurkiewicz

Defendants

William M. Coplin M.D.

Mercy Hospital of Buffalo

Keith Kaplan M.D.

Paul F. Pizzella M.D.

Nathaniel P. Billings M.D.

Jennifer K. Ray M.D.

Nicole Wedzina N.P.

Howard Stoll iii M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STAMM, BRADLEY J

Attorney at STAMM LAW FIRM

STADLER, MELISSA ANN

Attorney at Stamm Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

PAPIA, STEPHEN CHARLES

Attorney at Bargnesi Britt PLLC

BARGNESI, JULIET MARIE

Attorney at Bargnesi Britt PLLC

BRITT, JASON TYLER

Attorney at Bargnesi Britt PLLC

LOSS, JOHN TIMOTHY

Attorney at CONNORS LLP

MARKEL, KATHERINE VEITH

Attorney at Ricotta, Mattrey, Callocchia, Markel & Cassert

WATSON, CRAIG RANDALL

Attorney at GIBSON MCASKILL & CROSBY, LLP

SWEET, KATHLEEN MARIE

Attorney at GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

Supplemental Certificate of Merit

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

--none--

SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Amended Summons & Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

--none--

DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Demands

DEMAND FOR: Omnibus Demands; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS on behalf of Nicole Wedzina NP

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS on behalf of Nicole Wedzina NP; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS on behalf of Mercy Hospital

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS on behalf of Mercy Hospital; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Supplemental Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 02/09/2021; Received: 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 02/09/2021; Received: 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 02/09/2021; Received: 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2021; Received: 01/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Stadler, M.; Filed: 01/13/2021; Received: 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Amended Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Stadler, M.; Filed: 01/13/2021; Received: 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stadler, M.; Filed: 01/13/2021; Received: 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stadler, M.; Filed: 01/13/2021; Received: 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2020; Received: 10/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI (AMENDED); Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 08/24/2020; Received: 08/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Information Relative to Interviews of Health Care Providers; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Omnibus Demands; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS on behalf of Nicole Wedzina NP; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS on behalf of Mercy Hospital; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION; Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Bargnesi, J.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stamm, B.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less