This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 08:37:40 (UTC).

Lendr.online, LLC v. Encore Business Relief, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Lendr online, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Encore Business Relief, LLC. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Sher. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Sher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lendr.online, LLC

Defendants

Secure Account Services, LLC

EverTrust, Inc.

David Yi

Sae Han Total Cleaning & Staffing, Inc.

Veritas Legal Plan, Inc.

O3 Consulting Firm

Jongbok Kim

Encore Business Relief, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZAWODZINSKI, JAMES JUDE

Attorney at Hodgson Russ LLP

WELLS, STEVEN WILLIAM

Attorney at HODGSON RUSS LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ELIAS, T'SHURA ANN

Attorney at LUNDBERG & ELIAS, PLLC

SUH, SUN

FOX, MICHELLE LYNN

Attorney at Harris St. Laurent

MICHAEL, WENDY

Attorney at DLA Piper

GROSSMAN, BRIAN L

Attorney at Shipkevich, PLLC

SAVIC, STEFAN

Attorney at Shipkevich PLLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Veritas Legal Plan and Secure Account Services

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Veritas Legal Plan and Secure Account Services; Filed By: Zawodzinski, J.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Encore Business Relief, Evertrust, O3 Consulting Firm, and David ... show more

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Encore Business Relief, Evertrust, O3 Consulting Firm, and David ... show more; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Elias, T.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Grossman, B.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Grossman, B.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Michael, W.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Suh, S.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Fox, M.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Elias, T.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Fox, M.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Statement of Account

EXHIBIT(S) - C Statement of Account; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Encore Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Encore Agreement; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Veritas Legal Plan and Secure Account Services; Filed By: Zawodzinski, J.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Encore Business Relief, Evertrust, O3 Consulting Firm, and David Yi only; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Elias, T.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Grossman, B.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*; Filed By: Grossman, B.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Michael, W.; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/10/2019; Received: 09/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint for Secure Account Service, LLC; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Suh, S.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Fox, M.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Elias, T.; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Fox, M.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Statement of Account; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Encore Agreement; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Wells, S.; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less