This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 06/03/2020 at 11:50:13 (UTC).

LEIGH HELMICH v. GREENPAC MILL/GREENPAC HOLDINGS LCC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 LEIGH HELMICH filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against GREENPAC MILL/GREENPAC HOLDINGS LCC. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leigh Helmich

Defendants

VALMET INC

NORAMPAC INDUSTRIES

CASCADES INC

GREENPAC MILL

CASCADES CANADA LLC

GREENPAC HOLDINGS LLC

Laura Azzarella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPARACINO, JESSICA D.

Defendant Attorney

LAFFERTY, RIANE F.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI); Filed By: Lafferty, R.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

 

Docket Entries

03/13/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI); Filed By: Lafferty, R.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sparacino, J.; Filed: 12/05/2018; Received: 12/05/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less