This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 05/13/2020 at 17:32:20 (UTC).

Legal Servicing, LLC - v. - Kristie L. Apgar

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Legal Servicing, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Kristie L Apgar. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Tait. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2581

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Tait

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Legal Servicing, LLC

Defendants

Winn kristie L A/k/a

Kristie L. Apgar a/k/a Kristie L. Winn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEWARD, ANNEMARIE E

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/17/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Steward, A. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Steward, A. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C Judgment, Transcript of Judgment, Affidavit of Non-Military Service

EXHIBIT(S) - A-C Judgment, Transcript of Judgment, Affidavit of Non-Military Service; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2018; Received: 12/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/14/2018; Received: 12/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 12/11/2018; Received: 12/11/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Steward, A. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Steward, A. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/18/2018; Received: 10/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-C Judgment, Transcript of Judgment, Affidavit of Non-Military Service; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1); Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI; Filed By: Steward, A.; Filed: 10/02/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEWARD, ANNEMARIE E