Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 03:52:00 (UTC).

LEE FOSTER - v. - CORONA PARK REALTY INC et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 LEE FOSTER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CORONA PARK REALTY INC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Shlomo Hagler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Shlomo Hagler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee Foster

Defendants

RR RE INVESTORS LLC

CORONA PARK REALTY ASSOCIATES LLC

AMS EAST 6TH LLC

MNC HOLDINGS LLC

Aaron Daniels

FM EAST 6TH STREET LLC

620 26 JS LLC

CORONA PARK REALTY INC

PNL RE HOLDINGS LLC

EAST 89TH LLC

LB RETAIL LLC

MEHRARA 620-622 EAST 6TH STREET LLC

620 MACCABI LLC

WM RE INVESTORS LLC

620 EAST 6TH ST. HOLDINGS LLC

620 KHOO FAMILY LLC

RAFII PARNTERS LLC

620-622 EAST 6TH BH LLC

AD REAL ESTATE INVESTORS INC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIMBLE, ROBERT

Attorney at Grimble & LoGuidice,LLP

Defendant Attorneys

GOLINO, SANTO

Attorney at GOLINOLAW GROUP, PLLC

D'ANGELO, MASSIMO F

Attorney at ADAM LEITMAN BAILEY P.C.

KATZ, YISROEL A.

Attorney at ADAM LEITMAN BAILEY P.C.

KILLELEA, COURTNEY J

Attorney at ADAM LEITMAN BAILEY, P.C.

RUALO, CAROLYN Z

Attorney at Adam Leitman Bailey, PC

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #004)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #004); Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #004) Decision Dated 10.30.19

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #004) Decision Dated 10.30.19; Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #004) Answer - Corona Park Realty

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #004) Answer - Corona Park Realty; Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Answer - 620 East 6th St. Holding

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Answer - 620 East 6th St. Holding; Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Complaint; Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )

STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Katz, Y.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Grimble, R. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grimble, R. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Grimble, R. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E J-51 Benefits Internet Search

EXHIBIT(S) - E J-51 Benefits Internet Search; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D 2nd Spread Sheet Calculations

EXHIBIT(S) - D 2nd Spread Sheet Calculations; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Spread Sheet Calculations

EXHIBIT(S) - C Spread Sheet Calculations; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of Plaintiff's Inicial Lease

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of Plaintiff's Inicial Lease; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A DHCR Rent History

EXHIBIT(S) - A DHCR Rent History; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #004); Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #004) Decision Dated 10.30.19; Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #004) Answer - Corona Park Realty; Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Answer - 620 East 6th St. Holding; Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Complaint; Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Rualo, C.; Filed: 06/25/2020; Received: 06/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ); Filed By: Katz, Y.; Filed: 05/04/2020; Received: 05/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Killelea, C.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Grimble, R. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Grimble, R. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Grimble, R. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 08/30/2017; Received: 08/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E J-51 Benefits Internet Search; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D 2nd Spread Sheet Calculations; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Spread Sheet Calculations; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of Plaintiff's Inicial Lease; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A DHCR Rent History; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Grimble, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less