This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:48:28 (UTC).

LAWRENCE TINNIRELLO v. DIOCESE OF BROOKLYN et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 LAWRENCE TINNIRELLO filed an Other lawsuit against DIOCESE OF BROOKLYN. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence Tinnirello

Defendants

DIOCESE OF BROOKLYN a/k/a THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF BROOKLYN, NEW YORK

HOLY FAMILY

HOLY FAMILY-SAINT LAURENCE

DOES 1-5 whose identities are unknown to Plaintiff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAIKH, NAHID AFTAB

Attorney at Jeff Anderson & Associates, P.A.

GOFFE, TRUSHA PATEL

Attorney at Jeff Anderson & Associates, P.A.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants)

EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs)

EXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

ORDER - AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver

ORDER - AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Hon. George J. Silver (Directing Master Index Number)

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Hon. George J. Silver (Directing Master Index Number); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: Hon. George J. Silver

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #1 Hon. George J. Silver

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #1 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Goffe, T.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) Exhibit E to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Defendants); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) Exhibit D to CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver (Standard Combined Demands directed at Plaintiffs); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2021; Received: 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Hon. George J. Silver (Directing Master Index Number); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #1 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Goffe, T.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less