This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 20:57:38 (UTC).

Lawrence LiPuma et al v. Tops Markets, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 Lawrence LiPuma filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Tops Markets, LLC. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lawrence Lipuma

Kathleen Lipuma

Defendants

Lancaster-Rehm Associates, LLC

Accadia Site Contracting, Inc.

Benderson Development Company, LLC

Rehm-Transit Associates, LLC

Tops Markets, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOWEY, BRIAN KEVIN

Defendant Attorneys

CRAWFORD, ROBERT ANTHONY

Attorney at Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP

FERRARA, PAUL GERARD

Attorney at COSTELLO, COONEY & FEARON, PLLC

NASH, JAMES JOHN

Attorney at Nash Connors, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

--none--

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)

REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Nash, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

ANSWER of Accadia Site Contracting

ANSWER of Accadia Site Contracting; Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Crawford, R.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Nash, J.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Nash, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER of Accadia Site Contracting; Filed By: Ferrara, P.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Towey, B.; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less