Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 16:20:53 (UTC).

LAURA HEGLER - v. - JOSHUA MITGANG M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 LAURA HEGLER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JOSHUA MITGANG M D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Hegler

Defendants

Barry Rosenthal M.D.

Joshua Mitgang M.D.

WINTHROP UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL

ORLIN & COHEN ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEITZ, ANDREW LAWRENCE

Attorney at WEITZ PASCALE

PASCALE, BRIAN C

Attorney at WeitzPascale

Defendant Attorneys

WILD, JACQUELINE A.

Attorney at MARTIN CLEARWATER & BELL, LLP

FREIDLIN, DANIEL L.

Attorney at MARTIN CLEARWATER & BELL LLP

HICKEY, CHRISTINE BEGGS

Attorney at LEWIS JOHS AVALLONE AVILES, LLP

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit M of NOM

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit L of NOM

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit K of NOM

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit J of NOM

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit I of NOM

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit H of NOM

ANSWER

answer as to Rosenthal

ANSWER

answer as to NYU Winthrop Hospital

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER

VERIFIED ANSWER, NOTICE OF EBT, DEMAND FOR BP (ORLIN & COHEN ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES, LLP)

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER

VERIFIED ANSWER, NOTICE FOR EBT, DEMAND FOR BP (JOSHUA MITGANG, M.D.)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

Certificate of Merit

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons and Complaint with Verification

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Pascale, B.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*; Filed By: Pascale, B.; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) Exhibit M of NOM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wild, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Exhibit L of NOM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wild, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Exhibit K of NOM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wild, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Exhibit J of NOM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wild, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Exhibit I of NOM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wild, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Exhibit H of NOM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wild, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Exhibit G of NOM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Wild, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Pascale, B.; Filed: 06/26/2018; Received: 06/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER answer as to Rosenthal; Filed By: Freidlin, D.; Filed: 08/18/2017; Received: 08/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER answer as to NYU Winthrop Hospital; Filed By: Freidlin, D.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hickey, C.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER, NOTICE OF EBT, DEMAND FOR BP (ORLIN & COHEN ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES, LLP); Filed By: Hickey, C.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hickey, C.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER, NOTICE FOR EBT, DEMAND FOR BP (JOSHUA MITGANG, M.D.); Filed By: Hickey, C.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pascale, B.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Weitz, A.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint with Verification; Filed By: Weitz, A.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less