This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:55:04 (UTC).

Laura Caruso - v. - Dollar Tree INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Laura Caruso filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dollar Tree INC. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Caruso

Defendants and Petitioners

Dollar Tree INC.

Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.

Hauppauge, LLC

Bikers Apparel, Inc.

Respondent

TORMAX USA INC. individually and as successor in interest to TORMAX TECHNOLOGIES INC. and TORMAX USA INC. d/b/a TORMAX TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Not Yet Classified

Martyn & Martyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDELMAN, PAUL B.

Attorney at EDELMAN, KRASIN & JAYE, PLLC

SPANO, SAL ANTHONY

Attorney at Edelman, Krasin & Jaye, PLLC.

ROSEN, KARA MICHELLE

Attorney at Edelman, Krasin & Jaye, PLLC

Petitioner Attorney

ANDRE N POULIS (DT7202)

Defendant Attorneys

CALVACCA, ANTHONY STEVEN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANDREA SAWYERS

POULIS, ANDRE N

Attorney at Law Office of Andre N. Poulis, P.C.

Respondent Attorney

KATERYNA STUPNEVICH

Not Yet Classified Attorney

YONG, JEFFREY P

Attorney at MARTYN TOHER MARTYN & ROSSI

 

Court Documents

ANSWER Answer with Discovery Demands

ANSWER Answer with Discovery Demands; Filed By: Calvacca, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

ORDER - JOINT TRIAL

Joint trial & discovery with case from Queens # 716734/17

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

Affirmation in Reply

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

partial aff in opp

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

Ltr to Court - Adj Motions 10.26.18 to 11.9.18 with Fax Confirmation

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer with Discovery Demands; Filed By: Calvacca, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Stupnevich, K.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Desena, L.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - JOINT TRIAL (Motion #003) Joint trial & discovery with case from Queens # 716734/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Rosen, K.; Filed: 11/08/2018; Received: 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Affirmation in Reply; Filed By: Desena, L.; Filed: 11/02/2018; Received: 11/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #S001); Filed By: Poulis, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) partial aff in opp; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 10/31/2018; Received: 10/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #S001) Ltr to Court - Adj Motions 10.26.18 to 11.9.18 with Fax Confirmation; Filed By: Spano, S.; Filed: 10/25/2018; Received: 10/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003); Filed By: Stupnevich, K.; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Poulis, A.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Poulis, A.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Edelman, P. - filed by Edelman, Krasin, Jaye PLLC; Filed: 11/07/2017; Received: 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Poulis, A.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Poulis, A.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Edelman, P. - filed by Edelman, Krasin, Jaye PLLC; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Edelman, P. - filed by Edelman, Krasin, Jaye PLLC; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Edelman, P. - filed by Edelman, Krasin, Jaye PLLC; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Edelman, P. - filed by Edelman, Krasin, Jaye PLLC; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Edelman, P. - filed by Edelman, Krasin, Jaye PLLC; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less