This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:41:44 (UTC).

LATISHA WILLIAMS - v. - JEFFERSON NOEL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 LATISHA WILLIAMS filed an Other lawsuit against JEFFERSON NOEL. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Latisha Williams

Defendant

Jefferson Noel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLERSTEIN, HEDVA

Attorney at HEDVA WELLERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 11/07/2017; Received: 11/07/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Whiteker, H.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Whiteker, H.; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

ANSWER Answer with Omnibus Demands

ANSWER Answer with Omnibus Demands; Filed By: Whiteker, H.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Whiteker, H.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Whiteker, H.; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Whiteker, H.; Filed: 11/13/2017; Received: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 11/07/2017; Received: 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Whiteker, H.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer with Omnibus Demands; Filed By: Whiteker, H.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less