This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/24/2020 at 18:25:33 (UTC).

LARONE BUTLER - v. - MARCO REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 LARONE BUTLER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MARCO REALTY ASSOCIATES, L P. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larone Butler

Defendants and Petitioners

MARCO REALTY ASSOCIATES, L.P.

JAMES HUNT CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

ALWAYS FIRST, INC.

ALL-RITE CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

QCC Maintnenance Inc.

Respondents and Defendants

QCC MAINTENANCE INC.

ALWAYS FIRST, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAMOND, BETH MICHELLE

Petitioner Attorney

JOHN E SPARLING JOHN A. DARMINIO NADINE GABAI

Defendant Attorneys

McGinnis, Kevin Joseph

DARMINIO, JOHN A.

SPARLING, JOHN E

GABAI, NADINE

STONBERG, MICHAEL L

JEAN-BART, WENDY

Gambeski, George P

AMBROSE, WILLIAM

LEWIS, GREGORY P

CALANDRELLA, PETER JOHN

Respondent Attorneys

PETER JOHN CALANDRELLA GREGORY P LEWIS

MICHAEL L STONBERG (SCO 30402)

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Mcginnis, K.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

AFFIDAVIT Verfication by Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Verfication by Affidavit; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/12/2020; Received: 03/12/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Sparling, J.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Mcginnis, K.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Verfication by Affidavit; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIAMOND, BETH MICHELLE