This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 07/14/2022 at 16:13:36 (UTC).

Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC v. Richard Wolodin et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Richard Wolodin. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC

Defendants

Richard Wolodin

Crystal Wolodin

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

Midland Credit Management, Inc

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

John Doe #1 through #6, and Jane Doe #1 through #6, the last twelve names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants, tenants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest in or lien up

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBS, KYLE JAMES

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/22/2022; Received: 06/22/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING FOR: JOHN DOE, NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING FOR: JOHN DOE, NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/20/2022; Received: 06/20/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE, NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE, NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/16/2022; Received: 06/16/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING FOR: OCCUPANT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING FOR: OCCUPANT; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE, NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE, NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 MAILING FOR: CRYSTAL WOLODIN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 MAILING FOR: CRYSTAL WOLODIN; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRYSTAL WOLODIN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRYSTAL WOLODIN; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 MAILING FOR: RICHARD WOLODIN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 MAILING FOR: RICHARD WOLODIN; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RICHARD WOLODIN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RICHARD WOLODIN; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - F EXHIBIT F Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F EXHIBIT F Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E EXHIBIT E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E EXHIBIT E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D EXHIBIT D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D EXHIBIT D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/22/2022; Received: 06/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING FOR: JOHN DOE, NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/20/2022; Received: 06/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE, NAME UNKNOWN SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/16/2022; Received: 06/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 MAILING FOR: OCCUPANT; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE, NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #1; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 MAILING FOR: CRYSTAL WOLODIN; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRYSTAL WOLODIN; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 MAILING FOR: RICHARD WOLODIN; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RICHARD WOLODIN; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/14/2022; Received: 06/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 06/13/2022; Received: 06/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F EXHIBIT F Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E EXHIBIT E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D EXHIBIT D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Jacobs, K. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 05/26/2022; Received: 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less