This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 16:57:39 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC, v. MIGUEL A. DIAZ et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MIGUEL A DIAZ. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerard J Neri. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1006

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerard J Neri

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC,

Defendants

John Doe (SAID NAME BEING FICTITIOUS TO REPRESENT UNKNOWN TENANTS/OCCUPANTS OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY AND ANY OTHER PARTY OR ENTITY OF ANY KIND, IF ANY, HAVING OR CLAIMING AN INTEREST OR LIEN UPON THE MORTGAGED PROPERTY)

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK C/O CITY COURT OF UTICA

Miguel A. Diaz

(SAID NAME BEING FICTITIOUS TO REPRESENT UNKNOWN TENANTS/OCCUPANTS OF THE SUBJEC

Not Yet Classified

STERN & EISENBERG, PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorneys

WEISBLATT, STACEY ALLYSON

Attorney at Stern & Eisenberg

GEORGER, ROLAND RUSSELL

Attorney at Roland R. Georger, Esq.

BALTCH, TODD RYAN

Attorney at Feinstein Raiss Kelin Booker & Goldstein LLC

CASCINO, MARGARET JAFFE

Attorney at STERN & EISENBERG, P.C.

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE re: status on bankruptcy petition Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE re: status on bankruptcy petition Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Letter requesting status report by 1-30-20.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Letter requesting status report by 1-30-20.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Georger, R.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - ERICA

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - ERICA; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A ERICA RIVERA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A ERICA RIVERA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - CHRISTOPHER

AFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - CHRISTOPHER; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A CHRISTOPHER DIAZ - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A CHRISTOPHER DIAZ - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIGUEL A. DIAZ - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIGUEL A. DIAZ - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK C/O CITY COURT OF UTICA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK C/O CITY COURT OF UTICA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE re: status on bankruptcy petition Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Cascino, M.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Letter requesting status report by 1-30-20.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Georger, R.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - OCCUPANT; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - ERICA; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A ERICA RIVERA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - CHRISTOPHER; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOE A/K/A CHRISTOPHER DIAZ - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303B TENANT MAILING AFFIDAVIT - BLANCA; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT MIGUEL A. DIAZ - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MIGUEL A. DIAZ - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Baltch, T.; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK C/O CITY COURT OF UTICA - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisblatt, S. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Weisblatt, S.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less