This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 05/14/2020 at 04:19:05 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC v. MICHAEL G. ERRICKSON et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2018 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MICHAEL G ERRICKSON. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Rita Connerton. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2779

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Rita Connerton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

John Doe REMOVED BY ORDER

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP. APO HSBC PLATINUM MASTERCARD

Michael G. Errickson

Not Yet Classified

Fred Lutzen, Esq., Referee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WRAZEN, BRANDON MICHAEL

HYMAN, SARAH KRISTIN

GAZZO, NICOLE CAROL

POLOWY, AMY E.

GRUBEA, JESSICA JOY

Michalek, Sarah A

Not Yet Classified Attorney

LUTZEN, FRED

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Wrazen, B.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Wrazen, B.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Lutzen, F.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Wrazen, B.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL ERRICKSON 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL ERRICKSON 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL ERRICKSON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL ERRICKSON; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/31/2018; Received: 10/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE AFF OF NO TENANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE AFF OF NO TENANTS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/31/2018; Received: 10/31/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP. APO HSBC PLATINUM MASTERCARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP. APO HSBC PLATINUM MASTERCARD; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Wrazen, B.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Wrazen, B.; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Lutzen, F.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Wrazen, B.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Grubea, J.; Filed: 02/11/2019; Received: 02/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Michalek, S.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL ERRICKSON 3215; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL ERRICKSON; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/31/2018; Received: 10/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE AFF OF NO TENANTS; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 10/31/2018; Received: 10/31/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP. APO HSBC PLATINUM MASTERCARD; Filed By: Gazzo, N. - filed by Western New York Process Service; Filed: 10/26/2018; Received: 10/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Hyman, S.; Filed: 10/08/2018; Received: 10/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less