This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 07/13/2022 at 05:48:13 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC v. JENNIFER A. STASUL et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JENNIFER A STASUL. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

Jennifer A. Stasul

Francisco Jorge

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

PUTNAM HOSPITAL CENTER

Not Yet Classified

RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN, JENNIFER R.

Defendant Attorneys

MARSICO, JAMES

GURA, JOHN E.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

ROACH, PETER TATIAN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Marsico, J.; Filed: 06/30/2022; Received: 06/30/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gura, J.; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

AFFIDAVIT Non-military Francisco Jorge

AFFIDAVIT Non-military Francisco Jorge; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/10/2022; Received: 06/10/2022

AFFIDAVIT Non-military - Jennifer A. Stasul

AFFIDAVIT Non-military - Jennifer A. Stasul; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/10/2022; Received: 06/10/2022

AFFIDAVIT Occupant Mailing

AFFIDAVIT Occupant Mailing; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

AFFIDAVIT 1303 Tenant Mailing

AFFIDAVIT 1303 Tenant Mailing; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS John Doe #1 aka Juan Andres

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS John Doe #1 aka Juan Andres; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

AFFIDAVIT 3215 Mailing - Francisco Jorge

AFFIDAVIT 3215 Mailing - Francisco Jorge; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Francisco Jorge

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Francisco Jorge; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E SHARED EQUITY MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - E SHARED EQUITY MORTGAGE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - D LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENTS

EXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENTS; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 SCHEDULE A

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 SCHEDULE A; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 NOTICES TO DEFENDANT

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 NOTICES TO DEFENDANT; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Marsico, J.; Filed: 06/30/2022; Received: 06/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Gura, J.; Filed: 06/23/2022; Received: 06/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Non-military Francisco Jorge; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/10/2022; Received: 06/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Non-military - Jennifer A. Stasul; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/10/2022; Received: 06/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Occupant Mailing; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 1303 Tenant Mailing; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS John Doe #1 aka Juan Andres; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 3215 Mailing - Francisco Jorge; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Francisco Jorge; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 3215 Mailing - Jennifer A. Stasul; Filed By: Roach, P. - filed by RELIANT COURT SERVICES, INC.; Filed: 06/09/2022; Received: 06/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E SHARED EQUITY MORTGAGE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C ASSIGNMENTS; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B MORTGAGE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A NOTE; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 SCHEDULE A; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 NOTICES TO DEFENDANT; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brennan, J.; Filed: 05/25/2022; Received: 05/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less