This case was last updated from Putnam County Courts on 05/21/2020 at 13:23:36 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC v. JACKELINE CRUZ et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JACKELINE CRUZ. This case was filed in Putnam County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor G Grossman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Victor G Grossman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

Jackeline Cruz

John Doe

Rafael Cruz

Yakirys Cruz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEINERT, DOUGLAS CHARLES

Attorney at Gross Polowy, LLC.

Michalek, Sarah A

Attorney at Berardi Immigration Law

POLOWY, AMY E.

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY LLC

PUSCHECK, KATHLEEN ELIZABETH

Attorney at Gross Polowy LLC

PASCUZZI, ASHLEY MARIE

Attorney at GROSS POLOWY, LLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Power of Attorney

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer for Jackeline Cruz

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer for Rafael Cruz

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavits of Delivery pursuant to RPAPL 1303

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavits of Service of the Summons, per CPLR 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YAKIRYS CRUZ S/H/A JD 1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YAKIRYS CRUZ S/H/A JD 1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit to COM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit to COM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit to Complaint- Scedule D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit to Complaint- Scedule D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit to Complaint- Scedule C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit to Complaint- Scedule C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint- Schedule B- Legal Desc Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint- Schedule B- Legal Desc Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint- Scheule A- Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint- Scheule A- Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/17/2020; Received: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1); Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) Power of Attorney; Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) Answer for Jackeline Cruz; Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) Answer for Rafael Cruz; Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Affidavits of Delivery pursuant to RPAPL 1303; Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service of the Summons, per CPLR 3215; Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Puscheck, K.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YAKIRYS CRUZ S/H/A JD 1- 1303; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE YAKIRYS CRUZ S/H/A JD 1; Filed By: Polowy, A. - filed by Alstate Process Service, Inc.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit to COM Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit to Complaint- Scedule D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit to Complaint- Scedule C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit to Complaint- Schedule B- Legal Desc Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to Complaint- Scheule A- Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Pascuzzi, A.; Filed: 12/20/2018; Received: 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less