This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 00:17:07 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC - v. - GERALD ALSANTE et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GERALD ALSANTE. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0889

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

JOHN DOE #1- #50 and MARY ROE #1- #50, the last two names being fictitious, it being intended to name all other parties who may have some interest in or lien upon the premises described in the complaint

Gerald Alsante

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZORNEK, ANNA MICHELLE

Attorney at Schiller Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel, LLP

VOGT, MEGAN CAROLINE

Attorney at Schiller, Knapp, Lefkowitz & Hertzel, LLP

RUUSKA, RYAN E

Attorney at SCHILLER, KNAPP, LEFKOWITZ & HERTZEL, LLP

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Aff's of Post

EXHIBIT(S) - A Aff's of Post; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Aff of Pub

EXHIBIT(S) - B Aff of Pub; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale

NOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02); Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NO DOES/ NO ADDITIONAL DOES

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NO DOES/ NO ADDITIONAL DOES; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-GERALD ALSANTE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-GERALD ALSANTE; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/GERALD ALSANTE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/GERALD ALSANTE; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd NOP

NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd NOP; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 05/16/2019; Received: 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Aff's of Post; Filed By: Zornek, A.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Aff of Pub; Filed By: Vogt, M.; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE Notice of Sale; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #02); Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #02); Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01) Proposed Ex-Parte Order of Reference Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NO DOES/ NO ADDITIONAL DOES; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-GERALD ALSANTE; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by ProVest, LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/GERALD ALSANTE; Filed By: Ruuska, R. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd NOP; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ruuska, R.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less