This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:48:41 (UTC).

Laila Ibrahim - v. - Ernesto Pacheco

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Laila Ibrahim filed an Other lawsuit against Ernesto Pacheco. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laila Ibrahim

Defendant

Ernesto Pacheco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVOLI, HENRY W

Attorney at The Law Offices of Henry W. Davoli Jr PLLC

Defendant Attorney

WINN, FRANSHONE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES BILELLO & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Davoli, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Davoli, H.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization - gs

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization - gs; Filed By: Winn, F. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

ORDER - OTHER Dated: 3/27/2018

ORDER - OTHER Dated: 3/27/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

ANSWER Answer with Demands

ANSWER Answer with Demands; Filed By: Winn, F. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 9/25/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 9/25/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Davoli, H.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Davoli, H.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Winn, F. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Winn, F. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/24/2018; Received: 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Dated: 3/27/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DTD 9/25/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Davoli, H.; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Davoli, H.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Davoli, H.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization - gs; Filed By: Winn, F. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer with Demands; Filed By: Winn, F. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Davoli, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less