This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 13:11:56 (UTC).

Kristin N. Bradfield - v. - City of Niagara Falls et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 Kristin N Bradfield filed an Other lawsuit against City of Niagara Falls. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristin N. Bradfield

Defendants

John A. Rosino

City of Niagara Falls

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOYD, STEPHEN

Attorney at Steve Boyd, PC

COSTANZO, LEAH ANNE

Attorney at Steve Boyd PC

Defendant Attorney

DEBOY, THOMAS J.

Attorney at CITY OF NIAGARA FALLS LAW DEPARTMENT

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Costanzo, L.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Oswestry Neck Pain Questionnaire dated 2-22-17

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Oswestry Neck Pain Questionnaire dated 2-22-17; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Emergency Room record from Mt. St. Mary's

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Emergency Room record from Mt. St. Mary's; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Note of Issue and Statement or Readiness

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Note of Issue and Statement or Readiness; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants' demand for a BOP

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants' demand for a BOP; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Verified BOP

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Verified BOP; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Deposition Testimony of plaintiff - redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Deposition Testimony of plaintiff - redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation of Thomas J. DeBoy, Esq.

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation of Thomas J. DeBoy, Esq.; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Dr. Delmonte Report

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Dr. Delmonte Report; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Compel

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Compel; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING signed

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/18/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer of the City of Niagara Falls

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer of the City of Niagara Falls; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Costanzo, L.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Oswestry Neck Pain Questionnaire dated 2-22-17; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Emergency Room record from Mt. St. Mary's; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Note of Issue and Statement or Readiness; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Defendants' demand for a BOP; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Verified BOP; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Deposition Testimony of plaintiff - redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation of Thomas J. DeBoy, Esq.; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Dr. Delmonte Report; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Notice of Entry and Order; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/06/2019; Received: 08/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Compel; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/10/2018; Received: 08/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2018; Received: 05/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 04/26/2018; Received: 04/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer of the City of Niagara Falls; Filed By: Deboy, T.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boyd, S.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less