Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 13:01:03 (UTC).

KRISTA FARLEY et al v. MARY S. ELACQUA M.D. et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 KRISTA FARLEY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MARY S ELACQUA M D. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Christina L Ryba. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5-19

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Christina L Ryba

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Farley

Krista Farley

Defendants

COMMUNITY CARE PHYSICIANS, P.C. d/b/a CAPITAL REGION WOMEN'S CARE

D/B/A CAPITAL REGION WOMEN'S CARE

ST. PETER'S HEALTH PARTNERS

Mary S. Elacqua M.D.

Christopher Andrew Bloss M.D.

SAMARITAN HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK, ALAN W

Attorney at The Law Firm of Alan W. Clark & Associates, LLC

CLARK, ALAN W.

Attorney at ALAN W. CLARK. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MONACO, MACKENZIE C

Attorney at CARTER, CONBOY, CASE, BLACKMORE, MALONEY & LAIRD

WISNIEWSKI, GINA TERESA

Attorney at Monaco Cooper & Carr PLLC

STORM, MICHELLE ANN

Attorney at Monaco, Cooper & Carr, PLLC

MONACO, MACKENZIE C.

Attorney at MONACO, COOPER LAMME & CARR, PLLC

KESTERKE, MACKENZIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at Maguire Cardona, PC

EZICK, RANDALL J

Attorney at Maguire Cardona PC

YOQUINTO, ELIZABETH BRYANT

Attorney at Maguire Cardona, P.C.

KURYLUK, AMANDA KATERI

Attorney at MAGUIRE CARDONA, PC

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Wisniewski, G.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Monaco, M.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Monaco, M.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Monaco, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Storm, M.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Storm, M.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mary S. Elacqua, M.D.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mary S. Elacqua, M.D.; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ezick, R.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

ANSWER on behalf of Defendant Samaritan Hospital

ANSWER on behalf of Defendant Samaritan Hospital; Filed By: Ezick, R.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Community Care Physicians, P.C. d/b/a Capital Region Women's Care

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Community Care Physicians, P.C. d/b/a Capital Region Women's Care; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ezick, R.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Ezick, R.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Wisniewski, G.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Monaco, M.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Monaco, M.; Filed: 02/08/2020; Received: 02/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPOINTMENT NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Monaco, M.; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Storm, M.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Storm, M.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kesterke, M.; Filed: 11/15/2019; Received: 11/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Christopher Andrew Bloss, M.D.; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Mary S. Elacqua, M.D.; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ezick, R.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER on behalf of Defendant Samaritan Hospital; Filed By: Ezick, R.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Community Care Physicians, P.C. d/b/a Capital Region Women's Care; Filed By: Clark, A. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ezick, R.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Ezick, R.; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Clark, A.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less