This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 02:59:39 (UTC).

KRE Broadway Owner, LLC v. Yuan Sun et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 KRE Broadway Owner, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Yuan Sun. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard D Steinman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Leonard D Steinman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRE Broadway Owner, LLC

Defendants

Yuan Sun

Yu Huang

Tiqiong Qu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUMMINGS, ANTHONY W

Attorney at ANTHONY W. CUMMINGS, ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SHI, BO

Attorney at SHI & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

SUR-REPLY (Motion #001)

SUR-REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Warrant and Judgment

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Warrant and Judgment; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Invoices and Expenses

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Invoices and Expenses; Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service - Summons & Complaint

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service - Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Written Demand

EXHIBIT(S) - D Written Demand; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Default Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - C Default Notice; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Guaranty

EXHIBIT(S) - B Guaranty; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lease

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lease; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

COMPLAINT Complaint

COMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUR-REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Warrant and Judgment; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Invoices and Expenses; Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Shi, B.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service - Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Written Demand; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Default Notice; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Guaranty; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Lease; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Cummings, A.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less