This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 16:22:06 (UTC).

KORE CONTRACTING CORP. - v. - TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 KORE CONTRACTING CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KORE CONTRACTING CORP.

Defendants

VOLMAR CONSTRUCTION, INC.

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAN, HENRY

Attorney at WILSON & CHAN , LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LUCAS, PAUL VICTOR

Attorney at Georgoulis PLLC

GEORGOULIS, CHRIS

Attorney at GEORGOULIS PLLC

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lucas, P.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lucas, P.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lucas, P.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lucas, P.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT Letter to Adversary for deficient response to interrogatories

AFFIDAVIT Letter to Adversary for deficient response to interrogatories; Filed By: Georgoulis, C.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

ORDER - INTERIM (Motion #1) dtd 9/10/19

ORDER - INTERIM (Motion #1) dtd 9/10/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Kore

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Kore; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Interrogatories

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Interrogatories; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Plevritis, P.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

INTERROGATORIES

INTERROGATORIES; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

ANSWER Answer to Counterclaims

ANSWER Answer to Counterclaims; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Counterclaims

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Counterclaims; Filed By: Plevritis, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Defendant Volmar

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Defendant Volmar; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Defendant Travelers

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Defendant Travelers; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Lucas, P.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lucas, P.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lucas, P.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Lucas, P.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Letter to Adversary for deficient response to interrogatories; Filed By: Georgoulis, C.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INTERIM (Motion #1) dtd 9/10/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Kore; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Interrogatories; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/16/2019; Received: 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation of Peter Plevritis, Esq. in Further Support of Motion; Filed By: Plevritis, P.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Plevritis, P.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Plevritis, P.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Counterclaims; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Counterclaims; Filed By: Plevritis, P.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Defendant Volmar; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Defendant Travelers; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Chan, H.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less