Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 03:58:09 (UTC).

KONSTANTINOS PAPANDRIKOS v. A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 KONSTANTINOS PAPANDRIKOS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel J. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel J. Mendez

 

Party Details

Defendants

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.,

SPIRAX SARCO, INC.

FMC CORPORATION,

FLOWSERVE US, INC. Solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Edward Vogt Valve Company, and Vogt Valve Company

BMCE Inc. f/k/a United Centrifugal Pump

GOULDS PUMPS LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.,

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC

ROPER PUMP COMPANY

GARDNER DENVER, INC

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

KOHLER CO.,

TENNECO AUTOMOTIVE OPERATING COMPANY INC

Taco, Inc.

Anchor Darling Valve Company

ELLIOTT COMPANY

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

ITT LLC.,

Carver Pump Company

DAP, INC.,

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MESSEMER, CYNTHIA KULAS

Attorney at HODGES WALSH MESSEMER & BURKE, LLP

HODGES, GEORGE STEPHEN

Attorney at HODGES WALSH & MESSEMER, LLP

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

NOVAKIDIS, STEPHEN

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

PASCARELLA, LISA M.

Attorney at PASCARELLA DIVITA LINDENBAUM & TOMASZEWSKI

GREENBERG, IRA G

Attorney at LOCKE LORD LLP

HAAG, SARAH RUTH

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

Other Attorneys

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

GREEN, ALEXANDER TRENCH

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP

MENDELSOHN, RICHARD LEE

Attorney at Malaby & Bradley, LLC

CARNI, URIEL SHMAYA

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd.

ROHANI, SAMAE

Attorney at Haworth Barber & Gerstman, LLC

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

HOWARTH, JOHN SAMUEL

Attorney at WILBRAHAM, LAWLER & BUBA

CAREATHERS, BENJAMIN LOWELL

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY LLC

CURTIS, MICHAEL JAMES

MUNDO, ANDREW JOHN

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery LLP

SHULTZ, WILLIAM D.

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

KAUFMAN, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C.

40 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Dimarco, E.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Dimarco, E.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) with letter to Ambre Brandis

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) with letter to Ambre Brandis; Filed By: Riemer, J. - filed by Hoagland Longo Moran Dunst & Doukas,LLP; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Pneumo Abex LLC

NOTICE OF ENTRY Pneumo Abex LLC; Filed By: Sargente, A. - filed by HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Coughlan, T.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

STIPULATION - OTHER Tenneco's Dismissal Request

STIPULATION - OTHER Tenneco's Dismissal Request; Filed By: Testa, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance - Post Settlement - as to Defendant Taco, Inc.

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance - Post Settlement - as to Defendant Taco, Inc.; Filed By: Grady, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER Tenneco's Dismissal Request

STIPULATION - OTHER Tenneco's Dismissal Request; Filed By: Testa, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Pr ... show more

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Pr ... show more; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

ANSWER Roper Answer

ANSWER Roper Answer; Filed By: Novakidis, S.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

ANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint

ANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Curtis, M. - filed by Malaby & Bradley, LLC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

ANSWER Blackmer Answer

ANSWER Blackmer Answer; Filed By: Curtis, M. - filed by Malaby & Bradley, LLC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

ANSWER Crosby's Acknowledgement of Receipt

ANSWER Crosby's Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brandis, A.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

218 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Dimarco, E.; Filed: 06/12/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Dimarco, E.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) with letter to Ambre Brandis; Filed By: Riemer, J. - filed by Hoagland Longo Moran Dunst & Doukas,LLP; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Pneumo Abex LLC; Filed By: Sargente, A. - filed by HAWKINS PARNELL & YOUNG, LLP; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Coughlan, T.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Tenneco's Dismissal Request; Filed By: Testa, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance - Post Settlement - as to Defendant Taco, Inc.; Filed By: Grady, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Tenneco's Dismissal Request; Filed By: Testa, M.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Products Company; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Roper Answer; Filed By: Novakidis, S.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Rheem's Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Curtis, M. - filed by Malaby & Bradley, LLC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Blackmer Answer; Filed By: Curtis, M. - filed by Malaby & Bradley, LLC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Crosby's Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed By: Feroleto, K.; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 09/01/2017; Received: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Brandis, A.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less