This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:54:29 (UTC).

KLOSED LLC d/b/a KLOSED PROPERTIES LLC et al - v. - JACK JAFFA PERMIT SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 KLOSED LLC d/b/a KLOSED PROPERTIES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JACK JAFFA PERMIT SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KLOSED LLC d/b/a KLOSED PROPERTIES LLC

884 JEFFERSON BH, LLC

Defendant

JACK JAFFA PERMIT SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEITZMAN, JUSTIN SCOTT

Attorney at Kishner Miller Himes P.C.

LOLOI, JOSEPH

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.

KOOP, SCOTT E

Attorney at Kishner Miller Himes, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

NABER, PETER

Attorney at McManus Ateshoglou Aiello & Apostolakos, PLLC

SCHINDELHEIM, JACOB

Attorney at KOSS & SCHONFELD, LLP

SMITH, ZAHRA ALEXIS

Attorney at Koss &Schonfeld, LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Agreement; Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Koop, S. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Koop, S. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1) Memorandum of Law in Opposition

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1) Memorandum of Law in Opposition; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Kachanian Affidavit in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Kachanian Affidavit in Opposition; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Weitzman, J.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Koop, S. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Agreement; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Complaint; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) RADI, Notice to Appeal, Pre Argument, Affirmation of Service and Decision/Order

NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) RADI, Notice to Appeal, Pre Argument, Affirmation of Service and Decision/Order; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Weitzman, J.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) RADI, Notice to Appeal, Pre Argument, Affirmation of Service and Decision/Order; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 12/04/2017; Received: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 11/20/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1) Memorandum of Law in Opposition; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Complaint; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Agreement; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Kachanian Affidavit in Opposition; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Agreement; Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Schindelheim, J.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Koop, S. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Koop, S. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Koop, S. - filed by Bulldog Process Service; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Loloi, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less