This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:57:36 (UTC).

KISHANA LINDOR - v. - SYED M ALI et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 KISHANA LINDOR filed an Other lawsuit against SYED M ALI. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kishana Lindor

Defendants

Syed M Ali

Carmen Gallardo

AMERICAN UNITED TRANSPORTATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLERSTEIN, HEDVA

Attorney at HEDVA WELLERSTEIN

Defendant Attorneys

ISSERLIS, NANCY L

Attorney at NANCY L ISSERLIS

MCEVOY, JOHN PHILIP

Attorney at BAKER, MCEVOY, MORRISSEY & MOSKOWITS, P.C.

MORRISSEY, COLIN FRANCIS

Attorney at Colin F. Morrissey Esq/

TINNIE, SUMMER ELYNDA

Attorney at BAKER, MCEVOY, MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS, P.C.

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Wellerstein and Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue with Certificate of Readiness

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue with Certificate of Readiness; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Wellerstein and Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Answer for Defendant Syed M. Ali

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Answer for Defendant Syed M. Ali; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Answer for Defendants American United Transportation and Carmen Gallardo

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Answer for Defendants American United Transportation and Carmen Gallardo; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) AND DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) AND DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer and D&I Demands with Cross-Claim

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer and D&I Demands with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Wellerstein and Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Compliance

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Compliance; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Wellerstein and Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Wellerstein and Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Wellerstein and Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Compliance; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Wellerstein and Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue with Certificate of Readiness; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Wellerstein and Associates; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Answer for Defendant Syed M. Ali; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Answer for Defendants American United Transportation and Carmen Gallardo; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #5); Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer and D&I Demands with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Isserlis, N.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) AND DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/29/2017; Received: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less