This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 02:32:34 (UTC).

Kimso Apartments LLC. et al - v. - Dulcemaria Rivera et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2017 Kimso Apartments LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dulcemaria Rivera. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Judith N. Mcmahon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Judith N. Mcmahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

185-225 Park Hill LLC.

Kimso Apartments LLC.

Poonam Apartments LLC.

Defendants

Jennifer Jumah Brumskin

Dulcemaria Rivera

Make The Road New York Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRIGNOLI, ROBERT

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT PRIGNOLI

Defendant Attorneys

LAUFER, GREGORY FREDERICK

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON, LLP

BENJAMIN, JEREMY AARON

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Honorable Judith N. McMahon dated June 4, 2020 re: Trial date

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Honorable Judith N. McMahon dated June 4, 2020 re: Trial date; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

AD2 Decision

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

Supplemental Reply Affirmation of Jeremy A. Benjamin

EXHIBIT(S)

Transcript

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

Reply Affirmation of Jeremy A. Benjamin

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY

Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Make the Road Parties' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment

EXHIBIT(S)

Stipulation of Settlement

EXHIBIT(S)

Resident Ledger

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Stipulation between parties

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Stipulation between parties; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Summons and Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Jeremy A. Benjamin

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Jeremy A. Benjamin; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Prignoli, R.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Laufer, G.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Prignoli, R.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

210 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Honorable Judith N. McMahon dated June 4, 2020 re: Trial date; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 66 (Motion #008) AD2 Decision; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #008) Supplemental Reply Affirmation of Jeremy A. Benjamin; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 65 (Motion #008) Transcript; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #008) Reply Affirmation of Jeremy A. Benjamin; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #008) Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Make the Road Parties' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #008) Stipulation of Settlement; Filed By: Prignoli, R.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #008) Resident Ledger; Filed By: Prignoli, R.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #008) Lease and House Rules; Filed By: Prignoli, R.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
203 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Stipulation between parties; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Plaintiffs' Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Jeremy A. Benjamin; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Benjamin, J.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Prignoli, R.; Filed: 06/14/2017; Received: 06/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Laufer, G.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Prignoli, R.; Filed: 05/08/2017; Received: 05/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less