Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 14:00:28 (UTC).

KIMBERLY CONDOMINIUM BOARD OF MANAGERS - v. - NICOLASA RIVERA et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2017 KIMBERLY CONDOMINIUM BOARD OF MANAGERS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NICOLASA RIVERA. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1721

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Monroe County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY CONDOMINIUM BOARD OF MANAGERS

Defendants

PRECISION RECOVERY ANALYTICS, INC., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO COLLINS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. AIT PROVIDIAN NATIONAL BANK

Ibrahim Eissa

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK

A/K/A NICOLASA LOPEZ, by purchase, inheritance, lien or otherwise of any right, title or interest in and to the premises described in the complaint herein, and all creditors thereof, and, the respective husbands, or widowers of hers, if any, all of w

Robert L. Burkwit

ESL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

MCR RECEIVABLES CORPORATION

Adrienne Smith

Aida Ramos

Nicolasa Rivera ,if living, or if she be dead, her husband, heirs-at-law, next of kin, distributees, executors, administrators, assignees, lienors, creditors, successors-in-interest and generally all persons having or claiming under, by or through sa

JOHN DOE #1 THROUGH JOHN DOE #100

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Pamela Smith

Samuel Class

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES, L.L.C.

COUNTY OF MONROE

Crissa Blankenberg

Not Yet Classified

All New York Process Servers

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorney

EVANS, RICHARD J

Attorney at PHILLIPS LYTLE LLP

Defendant Attorneys

FLEMING, MARY ENRIGHT

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FEDERAL CENTRE

NEWMAN, JEREMY DAVID

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation and Notice of Appearance of New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation and Notice of Appearance of New York State Department of Taxation and Finance; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation and Notice of Appearance of the United States of America

STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation and Notice of Appearance of the United States of America; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Fleming, M.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation and Notice of Appearance of New York State Department of Taxation and Finance; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation and Notice of Appearance of the United States of America; Filed By: Evans, R.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Fleming, M.; Filed: 09/18/2017; Received: 09/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by All New York Process Servers; Filed: 09/13/2017; Received: 09/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by D&M LITIGATION SERVICES INC; Filed: 09/05/2017; Received: 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Evans, R. - filed by Frontier Abstract; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less