Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 06:54:12 (UTC).

Kim Bowers et al v. Rocky De La Fuente et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Kim Bowers filed an Other lawsuit against Rocky De La Fuente. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3-20

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffrey T. Buley

Kim Bowers

Defendants

PURPORTED REPUBLICAN CANDIDATE FOR PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Peter Kosinski

Andrew Spano , Commissioners of the New York State Board of Elections

Rocky De la fuente purported Republican candidate for President of the United States of America

, COMMISSIONERS OF THE NEW YORK STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS

Doug Kellner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNS, JOSEPH THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

GALVIN, KIMBERLY

Attorney at NEW YORK STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS

QUAIL, BRIAN LEE

Attorney at NEW YORK STATE BOARD OF ELECTIONS

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED So Ordered Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED So Ordered Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED So Ordered Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED So Ordered Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Final Hearing Officer report

EXHIBIT(S) - B Final Hearing Officer report; Filed By: Galvin, K.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A staff work sheets on objections

EXHIBIT(S) - A staff work sheets on objections; Filed By: Galvin, K.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING no positiion letter

ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING no positiion letter; Filed By: Galvin, K.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Peter A. Lynch

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Peter A. Lynch; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST; Filed By: Galvin, K.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A General and Specific Objections

EXHIBIT(S) - A General and Specific Objections; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED So Ordered Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED So Ordered Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Final Hearing Officer report; Filed By: Galvin, K.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A staff work sheets on objections; Filed By: Galvin, K.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING no positiion letter; Filed By: Galvin, K.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Peter A. Lynch; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST; Filed By: Galvin, K.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/20/2020; Received: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A General and Specific Objections; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Burns, J.; Filed: 02/19/2020; Received: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less