This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 07/21/2022 at 11:08:53 (UTC).

Kiavi Funding, Inc., f/k/a Lendinghome Funding Corporation v. 739 Holdings, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Kiavi Funding, Inc , f/k/a Lendinghome Funding Corporation filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 739 Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor G Grossman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Victor G Grossman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kiavi Funding, Inc., f/k/a Lendinghome Funding Corporation

Defendants

739 Holdings, LLC

Jotham Mcrae

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANDA, GREGORY JAMES

ZORNEK, ANNA MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1)

ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Business Records

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Business Records; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE #1-#50 AND MARY ROE #1-#50

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE #1-#50 AND MARY ROE #1-#50; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYS DEPT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYS DEPT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOTHAM MCRAE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOTHAM MCRAE; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 739 HOLDINGS LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 739 HOLDINGS LLC; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E Guaranty

EXHIBIT(S) - E Guaranty; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/28/2022; Received: 06/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Business Records; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE #1-#50 AND MARY ROE #1-#50; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYS DEPT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOTHAM MCRAE; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 739 HOLDINGS LLC; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 05/18/2022; Received: 05/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Guaranty; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 05/04/2022; Received: 05/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZORNEK, ANNA MICHELLE