This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:13:25 (UTC).

KHALIILAH JAMILAH WILLIAMS - v. - SALIM FOUERTEH et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 KHALIILAH JAMILAH WILLIAMS filed an Other lawsuit against SALIM FOUERTEH. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Khaliilah Jamilah Williams

Defendants

Nireen N. Sanders

Salim Fouerteh

Not Yet Classified

Nireen Sander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AJLOUNY, PAUL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF PAUL AJLOUNY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

SHULMAN, DMITRIY

Attorney at Elliot Ifraimoff & Associates, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

BODEN, STEPHANIE L

Attorney at CARMAN, CALLAHAN & INGHAM, LLP

PICCIONE, JUSTIN MICHAEL

Attorney at Rivkin Radler LLP

CAMPANA, JOHN PAUL

Attorney at RIVKIN & RADLER

MARCHELLO, CHARLES J

Attorney at JAMES F. BUTLER & ASSOCIATES

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KRUPNIK, ALLA

Attorney at The Krupnik Law Firm, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by Paul Ajlouny and Associates; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 09/10/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 09/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Joint Trial Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Joint Trial Order; Filed By: Krupnik, A.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Krupnik, A.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Boden, S.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by Paul Ajlouny and Associates; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by Paul Ajlouny and Associates; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A; Filed By: Campana, J.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Campana, J.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by PAUL AJLOUNY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by PAUL AJLOUNY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by PAUL AJLOUNY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by PAUL AJLOUNY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Boden, S.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shulman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shulman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANS & Cross-Claim with Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANS & Cross-Claim with Demands; Filed By: Marchello, C.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shulman, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by Paul Ajlouny and Associates; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 09/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Joint Trial Order; Filed By: Krupnik, A.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2); Filed By: Krupnik, A.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Boden, S.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by Paul Ajlouny and Associates; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by Paul Ajlouny and Associates; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A; Filed By: Campana, J.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Campana, J.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Boden, S.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by Paul Ajlouny and Associates; Filed: 11/07/2017; Received: 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by PAUL AJLOUNY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by PAUL AJLOUNY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by PAUL AJLOUNY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Ajlouny, P. - filed by PAUL AJLOUNY & ASSOCIATES, P.C.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Boden, S.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shulman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shulman, D.; Filed: 08/14/2017; Received: 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANS & Cross-Claim with Demands; Filed By: Marchello, C.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shulman, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less