This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 01:06:02 (UTC).

KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - v. - BARBARA KELLY-FELDMAN et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BARBARA KELLY-FELDMAN. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Westchester County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

SINGER HOLDING CORP

PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI LLC

Phill Feldman

Barbara Kelly-feldman AKA BARBARA KELLY FELDMAN

SLOMINS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DI CARO, JOHN A

Attorney at SHAPIRO, DICARO & BARAK, LLP

 

Court Documents

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE

REFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM

FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1-6 (Motion #2) EXHIBIT 1-6

EXHIBIT(S) - 1-6 (Motion #2) EXHIBIT 1-6; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) AFF OF SERVICES RENDERED

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) AFF OF SERVICES RENDERED; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2) COSTS OF PLAINTIFF

BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2) COSTS OF PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2) JFS

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2) JFS; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/MICHAEL PAUL FELDMAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/MICHAEL PAUL FELDMAN; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/BARBARA KELLY-FELDMAN AKA BARBARA KELLY FELDMAN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/BARBARA KELLY-FELDMAN AKA BARBARA KELLY FELDMAN; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ SINGER MANAGEMENT HOLDING CORP

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ SINGER MANAGEMENT HOLDING CORP; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ SLOMINS INC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ SLOMINS INC; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Mastriano, D.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Mastriano, D.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Mastriano, D.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF SALE; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM; Filed By: Di Caro, J.; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/10/2018; Received: 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1-6 (Motion #2) EXHIBIT 1-6; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2) AFF OF SERVICES RENDERED; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2) AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (Motion #2) COSTS OF PLAINTIFF; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2) JFS; Filed By: Di Caro, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 04/23/2018; Received: 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/18/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/PHILL FELDMAN AS JOHN DOE # 1; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/MICHAEL PAUL FELDMAN; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/BARBARA KELLY-FELDMAN AKA BARBARA KELLY FELDMAN; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ SINGER MANAGEMENT HOLDING CORP; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ SLOMINS INC; Filed By: Tarab, M. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 05/31/2017; Received: 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Mastriano, D.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Mastriano, D.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Mastriano, D.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less