This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:51:37 (UTC).

KEVIN THOMPSON - v. - NEW YORK CITY HEALTH & HOSPITALS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 KEVIN THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against NEW YORK CITY HEALTH HOSPITALS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Thompson

Defendant

NEW YORK CITY HEALTH & HOSPITALS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICHTENSTEIN, JOSEPH M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH M. LICHTENSTEIN, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

MEROLESI, KARI ANN

Attorney at DECORATO, COHEN, SHEEHAN & FEDERICO

PINNOCK, TANIA N.

Attorney at DeCorato Cohen Sheehan & Federico

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 1/8/20

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 1/8/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Merolesi, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

ORDER - VACATING NOTE OF ISSUE dtd 5/10/19

ORDER - VACATING NOTE OF ISSUE dtd 5/10/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

ORDER - OTHER By Judge Steinhardt

ORDER - OTHER By Judge Steinhardt; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 1/3/19

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 1/3/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 11/17/17

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 11/17/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical Malpractice Action

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical Malpractice Action; Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Merolesi, K.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Merolesi, K.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service - NYCH&HC

PROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service - NYCH&HC Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 1/8/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Merolesi, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - VACATING NOTE OF ISSUE dtd 5/10/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER By Judge Steinhardt; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/07/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 1/3/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2018; Received: 05/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 11/17/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2017; Received: 12/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Notice of Medical Malpractice Action; Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Merolesi, K.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Merolesi, K.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Proof of Service - NYCH&HC Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Lichtenstein, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less