This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 05/03/2020 at 14:27:16 (UTC).

Kevin Provost et al - v. - Indian River Central School District

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 Kevin Provost filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Indian River Central School District. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1509

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kevin Provost

Kelly Provost

Defendant

Indian River Central School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRUE, THOMAS A.

VANIER, STEPHEN ANDREW

Defendant Attorneys

POWERS, JOHN PATRICK

MILLER, FRANK WILLIAM

LEARY, ROBERT DADMUN

KISHORE, ANANT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Grue, T.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Miller, F.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Powers, J.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

ADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Grue, T.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Leary, R.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Vanier, S.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS

RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Vanier, S.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Telephone conference March 3, 2020 at 1:00 p.m.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Telephone conference March 3, 2020 at 1:00 p.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Jury Trial beginning January 11, 2021

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Jury Trial beginning January 11, 2021; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2020; Received: 04/20/2020

 

Docket Entries

04/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Jury Trial beginning January 11, 2021; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2020; Received: 04/20/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Telephone conference March 3, 2020 at 1:00 p.m.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS; Filed By: Vanier, S.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Vanier, S.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Leary, R.; Filed: 07/01/2019; Received: 07/01/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2018
View Court Documents

DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Grue, T.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Powers, J.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2018
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Miller, F.; Filed: 08/24/2018; Received: 08/24/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2018

DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Grue, T.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less