This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 20:44:25 (UTC).

Kevin Epps v. City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Kevin Epps filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Epps

Defendants

Correction officer John doe Badge Number Unknown

Captain l. Arias Badge Number 1269

City of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLLACK, JEFFREY ROBERT

Attorney at TRACIE A. SUNDACK & ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

FRANKIE, JAMES GEORGE

Attorney at FRANKIE AND GENTILE P.C.

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

ROSENCRANTZ, DAWN ZUROFF

Attorney at NYC DEPT. OF LAW OFFICE OF THE CORPORATION COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/24/2020.

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/24/2020.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Frankie, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosencrantz, D.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosencrantz, D.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service (Motion - Default Judgment)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service (Motion - Default Judgment); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhibit E - Good Faith Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhibit E - Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - E-File Confirmation (Affidavit of Service)

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - E-File Confirmation (Affidavit of Service); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service (Summons & Verified Complaint) on Defendant Cpt. L. Arias)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service (Summons & Verified Complaint) on Defendant Cpt. L. Arias); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Summons & Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Affidavit of Merit

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Affidavit of Merit; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Default Motion - Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Default Motion - Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion (Default Judgment - Defendant Cpt. L. Arias)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion (Default Judgment - Defendant Cpt. L. Arias); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service (Summons & Verified Complaint) on Defendant Captain L. Arias

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service (Summons & Verified Complaint) on Defendant Captain L. Arias; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/24/2020.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Frankie, J.; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosencrantz, D.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rosencrantz, D.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service (Motion - Default Judgment); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhibit E - Good Faith Letter; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - E-File Confirmation (Affidavit of Service); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service (Summons & Verified Complaint) on Defendant Cpt. L. Arias); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Affidavit of Merit; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Default Motion - Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion (Default Judgment - Defendant Cpt. L. Arias); Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service (Summons & Verified Complaint) on Defendant Captain L. Arias; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Pollack, J.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less