This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:13:49 (UTC).

KEITH FRANKLYN - v. - RUTHVEN CHARLES

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 KEITH FRANKLYN filed an Other lawsuit against RUTHVEN CHARLES. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Franklyn

Defendant

Ruthven Charles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLERSTEIN, HEDVA

Attorney at HEDVA WELLERSTEIN

Defendant Attorney

KLESTZICK, EVAN WILLIAM

Attorney at MCDONNELL ADELS & KLESTZICK, PLLC

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/04/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/04/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 01/22/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Klestzick, E.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 12/04/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2017; Received: 01/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 10/24/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Klestzick, E.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less