Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 20:57:32 (UTC).

KEISHA HENDERSON v. GLOBAL FURNITURE USA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 KEISHA HENDERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against GLOBAL FURNITURE USA. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Gianelli. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Sharon Gianelli

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keisha Henderson

Defendant

GLOBAL FURNITURE USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERARU, KENNETH STEVEN

Attorney at KENNETH S. FERARU, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, JEFFREY R

Attorney at JEFFREY MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Stipulation

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Stipulation; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

DEMAND FOR: PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DEMANDS

DEMAND FOR: PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO CPLR 3017(c) DEMAND

RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO CPLR 3017(c) DEMAND; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO SOCIAL NETWORKING DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO SOCIAL NETWORKING DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPOSNE TO SUBSEQUENT AND PRIOR INJURY DEMAND

RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPOSNE TO SUBSEQUENT AND PRIOR INJURY DEMAND; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO EXPERT WITNESS DEMAND

RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO EXPERT WITNESS DEMAND; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) VERIFIED ANSWER AND COMBINED DEMANDS

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) VERIFIED ANSWER AND COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Stipulation; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO CPLR 3017(c) DEMAND; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO SOCIAL NETWORKING DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPOSNE TO SUBSEQUENT AND PRIOR INJURY DEMAND; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO EXPERT WITNESS DEMAND; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO CPLR 306(b) DEMAND; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) GOOD FAITH CORRESPONDENCE; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) VERIFIED ANSWER AND COMBINED DEMANDS; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 06/18/2019; Received: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Miller, J.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Feraru, K.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less