Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 01:09:18 (UTC).

KAYLA JACOBSON - v. - MARTIN R. EGRE et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 KAYLA JACOBSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MARTIN R EGRE. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Nassau Dcm-Tj. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Nassau Dcm-Tj

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kayla Jacobson

Defendants

A & E & K OB-GYN

Martin R. Egre as Executor of the ESTATE OF HOWARD R. EGRE

Richard J. Klein M.D.

A and E Ob/Gyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUNSHINE, JEFFREY A

Attorney at JEFFREY A SUNSHINE PC

Defendant Attorneys

GRANT, TIVARA

BLOOMSTEIN, LARRY DAVID

Attorney at AARONSON, RAPPOPORT FEINSTEIN & DEUTSCH, LLP

SEYER, JESSICA M.

Attorney at Aaronson, Rappaport, Feinstein & Deutsch, LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance - MARTIN R. EGRE, as Executor of the ESTATE OF HOWARD R. EGRE

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance - MARTIN R. EGRE, as Executor of the ESTATE OF HOWARD R. EGRE; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance -RICHARD J. KLEIN, M.D., and A & E OB/GYN, P.C., sued herein as A &E O ... show more

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance -RICHARD J. KLEIN, M.D., and A & E OB/GYN, P.C., sued herein as A &E O ... show more; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S)

Medical Records from Dr. Knochenhauer

EXHIBIT(S)

Medical Records from Dr. Kang / Weill Cornell

EXHIBIT(S)

Medical Records from Long Island Ob/Gyn

EXHIBIT(S)

Medical Records from Madonna Perinatal Services

EXHIBIT(S)

Medical Records from Sisselman Medical Group

EXHIBIT(S)

Medical Records from Egre & Klein marked at Dr. Kleins deposition

EXHIBIT(S)

Note of Issue

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

Demand for Bill of Particulars Defendant Egre

ANSWER

Verified Answer A & E OB/GYN, P.C.

ANSWER

Verified Answer Dr. Klein

ANSWER

Verified Answer Defendant Egre

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Service on Richard Klein, MD: A&E OBGYN and A&E&K OBGYN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Service upon M. Egre at West Islip, NY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affdiavit of Service on Martin R. Egre

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance - MARTIN R. EGRE, as Executor of the ESTATE OF HOWARD R. EGRE; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance -RICHARD J. KLEIN, M.D., and A & E OB/GYN, P.C., sued herein as A &E OB/GYN and A & E & K OB/GYN; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #001) Medical Records from Dr. Knochenhauer Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #001) Medical Records from Dr. Kang / Weill Cornell; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #001) Medical Records from Long Island Ob/Gyn; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) Medical Records from Madonna Perinatal Services; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Medical Records from Sisselman Medical Group; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #001) Medical Records from Egre & Klein marked at Dr. Kleins deposition; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Note of Issue; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Orders; Filed By: Seyer, J.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars Dr. Klein; Filed By: Bloomstein, L.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Bill of Particulars Defendant Egre; Filed By: Bloomstein, L.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer A & E OB/GYN, P.C.; Filed By: Bloomstein, L.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer Dr. Klein; Filed By: Bloomstein, L.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer Defendant Egre; Filed By: Bloomstein, L.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service on Richard Klein, MD: A&E OBGYN and A&E&K OBGYN; Filed By: Sunshine, J.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service upon M. Egre at West Islip, NY; Filed By: Sunshine, J.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affdiavit of Service on Martin R. Egre; Filed By: Sunshine, J.; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sunshine, J.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sunshine, J.; Filed: 04/21/2017; Received: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less