Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 04:14:19 (UTC).

KATRINA BALLARD as executrix of the estate of v. WINTHROP UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 KATRINA BALLARD as executrix of the estate of filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WINTHROP UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Nassau Dcm-Tj. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Nassau Dcm-Tj

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katrina Ballard AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF Hazel Worrell

Defendants

WINTHROP UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL

JOHN DOE, M.D. 1-3

Scott Gorenstein M.D.

Eric Slone M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLOBIN, GARY

Attorney at ALPERT, SLOBIN & RUBENSTEIN, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

CAFARO, CHRISTOPHER THOMAS

Attorney at MONTFORT HEALY MCGUIRE & SALLEY

BORANIAN, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at MONTFORT, HEALY, MCGUIRE & SALLEY LLP

MAURER, GREGORY MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE

PAPA, LAURA M

Attorney at Shaub, Ahmuty, Citrin and Spratt, LLP

LEAN, BRETT JUSTIN

Attorney at Shaub, Ahmuty, Citrin & Spratt

LEUNG, JAMES

Attorney at Esquire Bank

ABRAHAM, SHANDY WILSON

Attorney at Shaub, Ahmuty, Citrin & Spratt, LLP (SACS)

 

Court Documents

BILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO DEFENDANTS WINTHROP HOSPITAL, SCOTT GORENSTEIN, M.D. AND ERIC SLONE, M.D.

BILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO DEFENDANTS WINTHROP HOSPITAL, SCOTT GORENSTEIN, M.D. AND ERIC SLONE, M.D.; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE, CERTIFICATE OF READINESS, CERTIFICATION ORDER AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

PLAINTIFF'S CPLR 3101(d) RESPONSE

BILL OF PARTICULARS

AMENDED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO ERIC SLONE, M.D.

BILL OF PARTICULARS

AMENDED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO WINTHROP HOSPITAL AND SCOTT GORENSTEIN MD

BILL OF PARTICULARS

AMENDED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO SCOTT GORENSTEIN MD

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON LINDA GRIVAS

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

DEMAND FOR:

Demand for Notice of Deposition

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

ANSWER

Verified Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON ERIC SLONE MD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON SCOTT GORENSTEIN MD

ANSWER

Worrell v. Winthrop - Verified Answer with combined demands

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON NYU WINTHROP HOSPITAL

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT, SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO DEFENDANTS WINTHROP HOSPITAL, SCOTT GORENSTEIN, M.D. AND ERIC SLONE, M.D.; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 03/05/2020; Received: 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOTE OF ISSUE, CERTIFICATE OF READINESS, CERTIFICATION ORDER AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND PLAINTIFF'S CPLR 3101(d) RESPONSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS AMENDED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO ERIC SLONE, M.D. Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS AMENDED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO WINTHROP HOSPITAL AND SCOTT GORENSTEIN MD; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS AMENDED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO SCOTT GORENSTEIN MD; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON LINDA GRIVAS; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED BILL OF PARTICULARS AS TO SCOTT GORENSTEIN, MD; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 10/16/2018; Received: 10/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Demand for Notice of Deposition; Filed By: Papa, L. - filed by Shaub, Ahmuty, Citrin & Spratt, LLP; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Papa, L. - filed by Shaub, Ahmuty, Citrin & Spratt, LLP; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Papa, L. - filed by Shaub, Ahmuty, Citrin & Spratt, LLP; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Papa, L. - filed by Shaub, Ahmuty, Citrin & Spratt, LLP; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON ERIC SLONE MD; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON SCOTT GORENSTEIN MD; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Worrell v. Winthrop - Verified Answer with combined demands; Filed By: Cafaro, C.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UPON NYU WINTHROP HOSPITAL; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* CERTIFICATE OF MERIT, SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slobin, G.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less