This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 23:34:11 (UTC).

Katie B Austin - v. - Patrick R Hoadley

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 Katie B Austin filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against Patrick R Hoadley. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katie B Austin

Defendant

Patrick R Hoadley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MISITI, MEGAN ELIZABETH

Attorney at Bevilacqua Development, L.P.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER clerk stamp

ORDER - OTHER clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) *Corrected*

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Signed Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Signed Order To Show Cause; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Order to Show Cause

RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP; Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Certified copy of birth certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Certified copy of birth certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

PETITION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

PETITION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Signed Order To Show Cause; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: 202.6(b) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP; Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Certified copy of birth certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Misiti, M.; Filed: 06/01/2017; Received: 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less