This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 13:03:58 (UTC).

Kathy Morris v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Kathy Morris filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Alison Y Tuitt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Alison Y Tuitt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathy Morris

Defendants

Silverstein Properties, Inc.

The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

4 World Trade Center LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TANENBAUM, JAY H

TANENBAUM, JAY HARVEY

Attorney at JAY H. TANENBAUM

Defendant Attorneys

CURCIO, DOMINIC

Attorney at Quirk and Bakalor, P.C.

MONK, GLENN ALEXANDER

Attorney at Harrington, Ocko & Monk, LLP

MANN, EMILY C.

Attorney at HARRINGTON, OCKO & MONK, LLP

HELLBERG, JULIE C

Attorney at Harrington, Ocko & Monk, LLp

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 09/18/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 09/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 09/18/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 09/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Monk, G.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated: 09/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 09/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J.; Filed: 08/23/2019; Received: 08/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Monk, G.; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tanenbaum, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less