This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 03:34:53 (UTC).

KATHRYNN L TRIMBLE - v. - MARILYN G MALENCHEK

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 KATHRYNN L TRIMBLE filed an Other lawsuit against MARILYN G MALENCHEK. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathrynn L Trimble

Defendant

Marilyn G Malenchek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIACCIO, ANTHONY A.

Attorney at Schalk, Ciaccio & Kahn, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

YONG, JEFFREY P

Attorney at MARTYN TOHER MARTYN & ROSSI

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

responses with authorizations

EXHIBIT(S)

employment authorization

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Post EBT Demand for Authorizations

EXHIBIT(S)

Response to Demand

EXHIBIT(S)

Demand for Authorizations

EXHIBIT(S)

Note of Issue

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer and Demands

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

--none--

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

COURT NOTICE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI and PC

ANSWER

Answer and Demands

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Ciaccio, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) responses with authorizations Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ciaccio, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) employment authorization Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ciaccio, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ciaccio, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Post EBT Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Response to Demand; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Demand for Authorizations; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Note of Issue; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer and Demands; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Ciaccio, A.; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/03/2018; Received: 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI and PC; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 03/19/2018; Received: 03/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer and Demands; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ciaccio, A.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ciaccio, A.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less